Skip to Content

TheBlogReaders.com

Salesforce.com, PHP, MySQL, Javascript, Ajax, Htacces

Shortcut Tricks For Multiplication

Be First!
by November 6, 2015 Aptitude

Multiply any large number by 12 mentally in seconds

To multiply any number by 12 just double last digit and thereafter double each digit and add it to its neighbour

For example 21314 * 12 = 255768

Lets break it into simple steps : Multiplication Shortcut Tricks

Step 1: 021314 * 12 = _____8 (Double of Last Digit 4= 8 )

Step 2: 021314 * 12 = ____68 (Now Double 1= 2, and add it to 4, 2+4=6)

Step 3: 021314 * 12= ___768 (Now Double 3=6, and add it to 1, 6+1=7)

Step 4: 021314 * 12= __5768 (Now Double 1=2, and add it to 3, 2+3=5)

Step 5: 021314 * 12= _55768 (Now Double 2=4, and add it to 1, 4+1=5)

Step 6: 021314 * 12= 255768 (Now Double 0=0, and add it to 2, 0+2=2)

So your final answer of 21314 * 12 = 255768

(171)

Previous
Next

Leave a Reply